FRIENDS OF LITTLE PLUMSTEAD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1122936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising for Little Plumstead Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023

Total income: £6,067
Total expenditure: £6,527

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Bassham Chair 10 October 2023
None on record
Louisa Bassham Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Caroline Feavearyear Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Charlotte Cunningham Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Tess Scott Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2019 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £8.17k £5.06k £8.68k £8.02k £6.07k
Total expenditure £6.84k £4.08k £9.54k £7.99k £6.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 24 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 13 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 26 August 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Little Plumstead Primary School
Hall Road
Little Plumstead
NR13 5FA
Phone:
01603 712165