SHASSAB SEERAT-UN-NABI WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust is a family run trust based in the UK. It concentrates its work in the UK and Overseas to support the public. The main objectives and aims are to provide charitable relief and assistance to orphans and widows, promote awareness of Islamic knowledge and provide assistance in education and social/medical terms. Promotion of sports and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 21 April 2008: Standard registration
- SHASSAB SERAT-UN-NABI WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD IQBAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BASHARAT IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AZMAT ZAREEN IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ATTIA ZAREEN IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AYSHA SAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAROON IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAAIMA ZAREEN IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZARINA BEGUM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR SHAUKAT NAVEED IQBAL-KHOKHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.08k | £16.58k | £20.27k | £44.30k | £26.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.91k | £5.39k | £4.87k | £13.08k | £22.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 2008 as amended on 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE IN ANY MANNER THAT IS CHARITABLE TO ORPHANS AND WIDOWS WHO ARE IN NEED. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN CREATING AWARENESS ABOUT THE LIFE OF THE PROPHET MOHAMMED P.B.U.H. TO PROVIDE TRANSLATION OF THE HOLY QURAN IN THE MONTH OF RAMADAN. TO TEACH THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN A WAY THAT WOULD NOT CREATE ANY OFFENCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH HOLDING TEACHING SESSIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
234 Seymour Grove
Old Trafford
MANCHESTER
M16 0DT
- Phone:
- 01618604596
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window