THE H.S.A. FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CELEBRATING FAMILIES, UK (FAMILIES) THINK ABOUT YOUR LIFE, UK/USA (BREAST CANCER) ASHA BHAVAN, KERALA, INDIA/UK (LEARNING DISABILITY) UMZILA, SOUTH AFRICA (COMMUNITY, WOMEN, ARTS) CENTRAL MANCHESTER WOMEN'S AID, UK (EMPOWERING WOMEN)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- South Africa
- Uganda
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
- 19 October 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 19 October 2017: Funds transferred to 1163149 COMMUNITY CIRCLES
- THE H S A FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £0 | £31.35k | £42.14k | £8.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £9.54k | £67.14k | £14.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 26 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 07 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 08 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 29 OCTOBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 23 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, THROUGH THE ASSISTANCE AND PROMOTION OF SMALL BUSINESSES AND SELF-HELP COMMUNITY PROJECTS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PUBLIC BENEFIT IN MATTERS SURROUNDING PARENTING, FAMILY LIFE AND RELATIONSHIPS WITH A VIEW TO STRENGTHENING AND ENRICHING FAMILY AND COMMUNITY LIFE IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE. TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UK AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window