BARNET U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitating education and training for older/elderly persons in the Barnet/North London area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
180 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
Governance
- 24 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hasan Mustafa | Trustee | 27 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johannah Fischer | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Murley | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Orr | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lois Barber | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Carstairs | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Averill Lovatt | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lipman | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Tambouridou | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Jenkins | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Bent | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.52k | £48.34k | £84.19k | £101.88k | £116.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.02k | £57.80k | £89.47k | £93.53k | £108.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN BARNET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2 THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
BARNET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Tudor Grove
Church Crescent
LONDON
N20 0JW
- Phone:
- 02039766112
- Email:
- admin@barnetu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window