Financial history Friends of Foulds

Charity number: 1122427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.77k £10.12k £23.51k £41.11k £39.99k
Total expenditure £18.60k £7.10k £10.93k £44.05k £47.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A