Friends of Foulds

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and grants to Foulds School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
Governance
- 23 January 2008: Standard registration
- FOULDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Nicholls | Chair | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ryan | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kellie Helbrough | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gilbert | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Lythe | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalynde Petrovitch | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Kotey | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.77k | £10.12k | £23.51k | £41.11k | £39.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.60k | £7.10k | £10.93k | £44.05k | £47.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 October 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 DECEMBER 2007. as amended on 12 Oct 2022 as amended on 12 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
2. THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (¶THE OBJECTS÷) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT, WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: THE CATCHMENT AREA OF FAULDS SCHOOL IN CHIPPING BARNET, HERTFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Foulds Primary School
Byng Road
Barnet
EN5 4NR
- Phone:
- 02084492714
- Email:
- friendsoffoulds@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window