COLDHARBOUR MILL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to provide a public working museum celebrating the history of the woollen textile industry for the advancement of public education, to preserve Coldharbour Mill as a building of historic and architectural value for public benefit, and to continue textile production.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £37,500 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
93 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 31 March 2008: Standard registration
- 10 July 2012: Funds received from 284294 COLDHARBOUR MILL TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryher Catherine Mason | Chair | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Crockett | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Siobhan Tyler | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Raymond Birt | Trustee | 29 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jilly Collins | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.46k | £417.03k | £283.98k | £281.99k | £406.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.15k | £178.89k | £409.15k | £393.33k | £284.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £312.29k | £18.64k | £57.73k | £37.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2008 as amended on 23 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT TO PUBLIC EDUCATION (IN PARTICULAR IN THE WOOLLEN INDUSTRY) BY THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC WORKING MUSEUM COMPRISING SUCH EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION ("THE COLLECTION"); B) TO PRESERVE COLDHARBOUR MILL AT UFFCULME IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
COLDHARBOUR MILL, UFFCULME, DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coldharbour Mill Working Wool Museu
Coldharbour
Uffculme
CULLOMPTON
EX15 3EE
- Phone:
- 07834368968
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window