TTP COMMUNITIES LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR ADULTS EXPRESSING A DESIRE TO RECOVER FROM ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ADDICTION, TO AID THE REGENERATION OF OUR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND SEDUCE THE OCCURRENCE OF DRUG RELATED CRIME, AND TO RELIEVE DRUG USERS IN THE REHABILITATION PROCESS INCLUDING TO HELP SUCH INDIVIDUALS OBTAI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Luton
- Warrington
Governance
- 11 April 2008: Standard registration
- 03 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NEW START HOUSING LIMITED (Previous name)
- T.T.P. HOUSING LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.14k | £207.84k | £283.28k | £233.93k | £204.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.55k | £213.86k | £266.41k | £243.43k | £171.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/12/2013
Charitable objects
1 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR ADULTS EXPRESSING A DESIRE TO RECOVER FROM ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ADDICTION TO AID THE REGENERATION OF OUR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND REDUCE THE OCCURRENCE OF DRUG RELATED CRIME IN THE AREA. 2 TO RELIEVE DRUG USERS IN THE REHABILITATION PROCESS INCLUDING TO HELP SUCH INDIVIDUALS OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window