Financial history SEEDS FOR AFRICA

Charity number: 1122357
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £40.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A