Financial history AMSTONE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1122709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £22.53k £24.63k £81.48k £42.74k £5.85k
Total expenditure £22.02k £24.99k £73.12k £47.15k £12.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A