SOUTH DEVON COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1122846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing financial support through awards, bursaries, and donations for students studying at South Devon College.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £1,668
Total expenditure: £6,509

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF SOUTH DEVON COLLEGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy Aspinall Chair 06 December 2018
None on record
Robert Watson Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record
Jennifer Bindon Trustee 22 June 2018
None on record
Dr Jon Goldman Trustee 22 February 2018
TORBAY MEDICAL RESEARCH FUND
Received: On time
MR SIMON RICE Trustee 18 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £2.70k £22.59k £12.02k £6.00k £1.67k
Total expenditure £11.25k £22.63k £15.09k £2.11k £6.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 22 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 06 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SOUTH DEVON COLLEGE
LONG ROAD
PAIGNTON
TQ4 7EJ
Phone:
01803540399