JAMAATUL ISLAMIYAH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education / Training Relief of Poverty Overseas aid / Famine relief Religious activities Arts / culture Sport / recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Manchester City
- Nigeria
Governance
- 21 June 2008: Standard registration
- JAMAATUL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr OLASENI OKUNOLA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BOLAJI GBADAMOSI | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
BABATUNDE AKANDE | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 581 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 581 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, TEACHING NATURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURES ON ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH. 3 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES, MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. 4 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES INCIDENTAL TO THE REALISATION OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 ALDBOURNE CLOSE
MANCHESTER
M40 8NE
- Phone:
- 07939011556
- Email:
- admin@jamaatul.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window