Governing document COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR LANCASHIRE (FORMER)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/09/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2013
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY ARE ESTABLISHED ARE: 3.1 THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE AND THE BOROUGHS OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN AND BLACKPOOL AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; 3.2 OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WHICH ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY INCLUDING THOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE AND THE BOROUGHS OF BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN, AND BLACKPOOL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.