BAPS CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) To relieve persons who are in need, hardship, poverty, sickness and distress as a result of natural or manmade disasters or by reason of their social and economic circumstances. (b) To relieve sickness and preserve and protect the health of persons. (c) To advance the education of people of all ages including promotion of Indian art, culture, heritage and tradition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hemal Patel | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Piyush Patel | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
SANJAY KARA | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|||||
MUKESH PATEL | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ARVINDKUMAR PATEL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.61k | £150.01k | £81.05k | £135.46k | £165.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.08k | £100.03k | £105.43k | £42.32k | £87.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PERSONS PRIMARILY IN INDIA AND THE UK WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP, POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF NATURAL OR MANMADE DISASTERS OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PERSONS LIVING PRIMARILY IN INDIA AND THE UK. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES LIVING PRIMARILY IN THE UK AND INDIA, INCLUDING PROMOTION OF INDIAN ART, CULTURE, HERITAGE AND TRADITION.
Area of benefit
INDIA AND THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54-62 MEADOW GARTH
NEASDEN
LONDON
NW10 8HD
- Phone:
- 02089652651
- Email:
- info@uk.bapscharities.org
- Website:
-
bapscharities.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window