THE EAST END FAMILY TRUST

Charity number: 1122415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply income to such charities for charitalbe purposes as the Trustees shall from time to time in their absolute discretion determine. These include to advance the evangelical christian faith and the christian religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £19,887
Total expenditure: £555,684

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARIE-PAULINE SOPHIE ANNE INGRID FRANCIS MACKINNON Trustee
None on record
DONALD IAIN ALASDAIR MACKINNON Trustee
None on record
Rev PETER ELLIOT IRWIN-CLARK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.04k £18.04k £2.10m £18.56k £19.89k
Total expenditure £347.22k £347.22k £382.75k £800.96k £555.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £2.08m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £12.28k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £382.75k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £6.35k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 October 2024 260 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 May 2023 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 August 2024 576 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EAST END FARM
EAST END
NEWBURY
RG20 0AB
Phone:
01635254895
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available