EASTBURY BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supplementary Education classes for KS2-KS3 age group; Advice, Information & guidance services for local disadvantaged people on issues effecting their lives. Capacity building training for members, volunteers and local unemployed people on job serach, Cv writing and inter view skills. Health awareness sessions for local BME communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 28 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Raj Miah | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL KADER | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Jalal Uddin | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Syed Harunur Rashid | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
AFRAZ MIAH | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MD Shahjahan Miah | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|||||
TALHA NOOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £1.80k | £1.89k | £975 | £890 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £1.20k | £1.09k | £915 | £870 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
3. AIMS AND OBJECTIVES A) TO SUPPORT BANGLADESHI AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY PEOPLE IN NEED LIVING IN THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM AREAS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT AND WELFARE BENEFIT RIGHTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. B) TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF BANGLADESHI WOMEN AND WOMEN FROM MINORITY ETHNIC GROUPS LIVING IN THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM AREAS WHO HAVE BEEN OR WHO ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR ABUSE. C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM AREAS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
IN THE BARKING AND DAGENHAM AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Sisley Road
BARKING
Essex
IG11 9SR
- Phone:
- 07503917646
- Email:
- UDDINJ1@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window