RAFIQUE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support school building and educational initiatives that qualify for Zakat in deprived areas of Pakistan, India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- Pakistan
Governance
- 11 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED MOHAMMAD WALIULLAH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYED NAUSHAD AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYED IRSHAD AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYED SHAHZAD AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.15k | £7.08k | £9.34k | £11.15k | £7.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £30.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2022 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED 19 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ASSISTING WITH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SCHOOL FOR GIRLS IN THE STATE OF BIHAR IN INDIA. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING HELP TO PEOPLE IN INDIA WHO ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
THE STATE OF BIHAR, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
143 LAMPTON ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 4EA
- Phone:
- 07448482185
- Email:
- SHAHZAD.AKHTAR19@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window