READING CARERS LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association is established for benefiting the community of Berkshire by advancing public knowledge of matters relating to substitute care of children & the education & training of foster carers; to relieve the need of foster children their carers & carers families, by the provision of advice, support & services; protection & preservation of good health of carers of foster children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Reading
Governance
- 15 April 2008: Standard registration
- RCL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
joanne Wood | Chair | 09 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julia Andrews | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Small | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Molly Priestley | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Monger | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria WEBB | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenni LOTT | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire SHEPHERD | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dimple Gillausseyh | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Esi Addo | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.44k | £13.36k | £10.01k | £6 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.38k | £14.44k | £16.52k | £2.96k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.30k | £13.30k | £9.98k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PURPOSE OF BENEFITING THE COMMUNITY OF BERKSHIRE BY: 1 ADVANCING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTITUTE CARE OF CHILDREN, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF FOSTER CARERS: 2 TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF FOSTER CHILDREN, THEIR CARERS AND THE CARERS FAMILIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, SUPPORT AND SERVICES: 3 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CARERS OF FOSTER CHILDREN WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Glenrosa Road
Tilehurst
READING
RG30 6AN
- Phone:
- 01189548293
- Email:
- Nickaddo@aol.com
- Website:
-
readingcarerslink.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window