Financial history TY CARIAD AFRICA

Charity Number: 1124100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.95k £78.70k £66.62k £67.53k £94.41k
Total expenditure £91.55k £70.71k £68.28k £74.73k £73.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A