Financial history B-P JAM ROLL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1124591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £363 £1.40k £1.12k £10.46k £242
Total expenditure £2.20k £955 £65 £624 £115
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A