Financial history THE NIGEL BERTRAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1122443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £29.76k £215.59k £142.81k £64.02k £161.05k
Total expenditure £83.74k £77.80k £63.44k £100.02k £76.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A