AN AFRICAN DREAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide education, meals, books, uniform for orphans at St Mark's School - in addition resourcing and developing school facilities Train Pastors, finance construction of church buildings, provide Bibles, fund conferences. Support microenterprise. Support women through provision of piglets, resources and training, Preaching, teaching and encouragement from UK volunteers Facilitating healthcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 March 2008: Standard registration
- AAD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Pink | Chair | 03 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Joy Littler | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Campbell-Wynter | Trustee | 06 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR JOHN COOK | Trustee | 18 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.34k | £52.61k | £47.36k | £49.54k | £52.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.26k | £52.56k | £40.50k | £58.72k | £56.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN EAST KASESE DISTRICT, WESTERN UGANDA, AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
EAST KASESE DISTRICT, WESTERN UGANDA, AND OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Fairacres
Prestwood
GREAT MISSENDEN
Buckinghamshire
HP16 0LE
- Phone:
- 01494 890724
- Email:
- aaduganda@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window