Financial history PARENT ACTION GROUP FOR SPECIAL PLAY

Charity number: 1124598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £19.17k £4.79k £7.27k £13.66k £28.95k
Total expenditure £19.27k £1.32k £15.67k £18.23k £17.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A