Financial history BOOKS AND BREAD FOR KENYA

Charity number: 1122698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £92.63k £74.72k £88.54k £86.62k £79.86k
Total expenditure £104.96k £577.73k £76.37k £83.06k £108.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.30k £3.16k N/A N/A