BOOKS AND BREAD FOR KENYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BBK travel to Kenya and select a needy church, orphanage or school and work with the person in charge to improve the basic conditions. BBK have built kitchens, libraries, provided healthcare, given food, clothes, beds, bedding to the poor. BBK has built homes for orphans. The charity provide school uniforms and equipment for those in need. Funds are used in a practical way to show the love of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Kenya
Governance
- 08 February 2008: Standard registration
- B.B.K (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSE ANN ELLIOTT | Chair | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NEATHAM | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA WALKER | Trustee | 26 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN NEVITT treasurer | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET HALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.63k | £74.72k | £88.54k | £86.62k | £79.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.96k | £577.73k | £76.37k | £83.06k | £108.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.30k | £3.16k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL TRUST DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY SHOWING AND DEMONSTRATING GOD'S LOVE THROUGH PRACTICAL ACTION TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE SUFFERING, IMPROVE AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN, FAMILIES AND ADULTS IN KENYA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard Grove
Durham Road
Chester le Street
DH3 3JX
- Phone:
- 07928950599
- Email:
- bbkafrica@gmail.com
- Website:
-
www,bbkafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window