BOOMERANG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Boomerang was set up to prevent re-usable household items entering the waste system and going to landfill, supporting Redditch re-cycling programme. We offer a free pick-up to Redditch householders to encourage donations which then go to help others in need of quality furniture etc at affordable prices; we also offer a delivery service for people on lower incomes who are unable to afford transport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LESLEY HARRIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE THORNE | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAYLEIGH LESLEY COONEY | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIA COONEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.72k | £31.25k | £42.77k | £49.76k | £34.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.97k | £40.72k | £35.53k | £36.98k | £31.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 819 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1184 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1549 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEBRUARY 2008.
Charitable objects
1. THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE, RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE REGENERATION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS.
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND BIRMINGHAM CITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17a PEBWORTH CLOSE
REDDITCH
B98 9JX
- Phone:
- 01527273488
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window