SMITHAM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR CHARITY RAISES FUNDS TO IMPROVE AND ENHANCE THE FACILITIES NEEDED TO PROVIDE AN EXCELLENT EDUCATION TO CHILDREN ATTENDING SMITHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 July 2008: Standard registration
- 09 January 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2016: Re-registered
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hunter-Richards | Chair | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Caroline Harvey | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorna Parker | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Anne Crossley | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Garner | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 14/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.45k | £13.54k | £5.80k | £21.85k | £26.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.06k | £20.19k | £18.84k | £9.41k | £22.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Smitham Primary School
Portnalls Road
COULSDON
Surrey
CR5 3DE
- Phone:
- 020 8660 4399
- Email:
- smithampta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window