THE FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN (SALFORD BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to improve the health and quality of life of Belarusian children, who continue to suffer the consequences of the Chernobyl nuclear disaster, by organising annual month long visits to the UK over a period of five years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Salford City
- Belarus
Governance
- 18 February 2008: Standard registration
- F.O.C.C (SALFORD) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN WADE ACIM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAT EDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JO-ANN CUNLIFFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ELIZABETH BRABBAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN OGDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERNADETTE COUSINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
.CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO RELIEVE CHILDREN FROM THE COUNTRY OF BELARUS BY THE PROVISION OF CARE AND WELFARE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR CHILDREN IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE SUPPLY AND TRANSPORT OF HUMANITARIAN AID FOR THOSE IN CHARITABLE NEED ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
BELARUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 ECCLES OLD ROAD
SALFORD
M6 7AF
- Phone:
- 0161 736 4096
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window