Accounts and annual returns CHISLEHURST YFC LIMITED

Charity number: 1122523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 01 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 01 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 08 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 08 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window