NEW LIFE CHURCH, CIRENCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ministering Jesus Christ. House fellowship network. Support church branches in Malawi. Wednesday street evangelism (4Soles); Friday evening prayer meetings 7:00pm; Baptism and outreaches. Boxed gifts to some families; Leaders training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Malawi
Governance
- 30 January 2008: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 September 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR KOLAWOLE FOLARIN TAYO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Etukudo Bassey | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Olugbenga Joseph Onakoya | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ernest Mainza | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.07k | £53.99k | £44.77k | £68.97k | £31.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.45k | £59.08k | £46.37k | £47.38k | £45.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £4.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN CIRENCESTER GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN CIRENCESTER GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Springfield Road
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 1SH
- Phone:
- 07952970417
- Email:
- KFTAYO@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window