BULLIESOUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peer Mentor Training (Secondary Schools) Playground Pals Training (Primary Schools) Online Bullying Workshops Creative Workshops Interactive, Educational Workshops Workshops for Parents Workshops for Educators Youth Ambassador Programme Information Publications Fundraising Events Community Awareness Events E-Mentors Volunteering Workplace Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,041 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 04 March 2008: Standard registration
- BULLIES OUT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janey Howell | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hopkins | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John King | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMMA THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.10k | £172.00k | £148.67k | £163.09k | £138.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.83k | £95.00k | £143.07k | £170.06k | £152.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £12.67k | £16.89k | £15.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.35k | £10.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2017 as amended on 08 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
A) TO FURTHER THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE UK WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM BULLYING. THIS WILL BE DONE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF AN INTERNET WEBSITE PROVIDING HELP, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION; B) TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ON THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL EFFECTS OF BULLYING;
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
T109
TITAN HOUSE
CARDIFF BAY BUSINESS CENTRE
LEWIS ROAD
CARDIFF
- Phone:
- 029 2049 2169
- Email:
- mail@bulliesout.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window