MISSING LINKS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OFFERING PRAYERS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Nigeria
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JACOB OYELAMI OLALERE | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
OPEDARE OLADIPO AYOOLA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL ADEBAYO RAIMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £2.01k | £2.29k | £1.98k | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £1.35k | £1.15k | £1.76k | £1.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 July 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 5 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 29 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FAITH INCLUDING THE WORSHIP OF GOD AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST TEACHING AND TRAINING OF MEMBERS TO BECOME LEADERS AND MINISTERS OF THE GOSPEL AND BY HOLDING REGULAR MEETINGS FOR THE GENERAL ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2 THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR INFIRM OR SICK 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE EDUCATION CHILDREN IN DANGERS OF DRUG TAKING/USE 4 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS BODIES ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED 5 THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LEWISHAM AND LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 KEEDONWOOD ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 4QJ
- Phone:
- 07957323645
- Email:
- ayocome2@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window