CHABAD LUBAVITCH CENTRES NORTH EAST LONDON AND ESSEX LIMITED


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has issued an official warning Open in new window
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Orthodox Jewish religion in accordance with the principles of existing and potential users. To attract, recruit and retain the best quality staff and volunteers. To provide high quality, cost effective service delivery across all services. To establish new partnerships and build on existing relationships and work with our partners in the areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£766,098
Donations and legacies | £730.29k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £9.48k | |
Investments | £26.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£893,164
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £893.16k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £893.16k |
People

10 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 28 February 2008: Standard registration
- CHABAD LUBAVITCH CENTRE NORTH EAST LONDON AND ESSEX LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN STEPHEN MITCHELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Yaakov Sufrin | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Joanne Alison Osen | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Daren Mark Burney | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PAUL JONATHAN GROMAN-MARKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
ELI ITZINGER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £597.30k | £733.62k | £919.81k | £659.05k | £766.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £653.18k | £632.85k | £799.38k | £786.61k | £893.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £118.92k | £75.37k | £9.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £562.97k | £703.74k | £889.55k | £627.95k | £730.29k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.11k | £3.83k | £4.23k | £4.99k | £9.48k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £26.23k | £26.05k | £26.03k | £26.10k | £26.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £614.42k | £631.09k | £795.13k | £782.74k | £893.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £38.77k | £1.76k | £4.25k | £3.87k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.41k | £18.04k | £1.21k | £148 | £38 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £360.60k | £348.65k | £334.36k | £343.90k | £327.34k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £119.54k | £278.55k | £417.13k | £259.54k | £147.10k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.12k | £58.40k | £62.27k | £41.77k | £39.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
I THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF CHABAD LUBAVITCH II THE ADVANCEMENT OR ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION III THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A TRAINING AND ADVISORY SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS TO ENABLE THEM TO ACQUIRE SKILLS TO EQUIP THEM FOR LIFE AND/OR EARNING A LIVELIHOOD AND; B OTHER EDUCATION PROGRAMMES TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY AND TO CONTRIBUTE USEFULLY TO THE LIFE OF THE COUNTRY IN WHICH THEY ARE LIVING; AND IV SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NORTH EAST LONDON AND ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chabad Lubavitch Centre
Doris Shpiro HOUSE
397 Eastern Avenue
Gants Hill
ILFORD
IG2 6LR
- Phone:
- 02085541624
- Email:
- admin@chabadilford.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window