Accounts and annual returns LEARNING AND SKILLS IMPROVEMENT SERVICE

Charity number: 1123636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 11 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 11 March 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 12 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 06 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 06 December 2012 On Time