Accounts and annual returns ESSEX COUNTY PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1123164
Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2021 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required