NEXT CHOICE (YORKSHIRE) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of services addressing problematic substance misuse. This is undertaken by way of a Structured Day Programme, service delivery is on both a group and individual basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 May 2008: Standard registration
- 07 September 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- NEXT CHOICE (Working name)
- NEXT CHOICE (YORKSHIRE) LIMTED (Previous name)
- NEXT CHOICE (YORKSHIRE) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.48k | £17.29k | £36.73k | £26.47k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.13k | £47.84k | £98.82k | £56.09k | £69.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 14 October 2019 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE AGENCY'S OBJECTS ARE; 1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE DEPENDENT UPON OR AFFECTED BY THE USE OF DRUGS OR ALCOHOL. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE PUBLIC, VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES ABOUT MATTERS RELATING TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window