MOORS YOUTH SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE SPORTS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD BUTT | Chair | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Barrow | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christiana Heard | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN THOMAS | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MARK HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW STEPHEN HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.64k | £7.84k | £24.89k | £56.03k | £51.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.03k | £8.90k | £24.61k | £48.80k | £46.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 2007 AMENDED 8 JULY 2008 as amended on 08 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Elizabeth Road
CULLOMPTON
Devon
EX15 1ZE
- Phone:
- 07975595789
- Email:
- MoorsYouthFC@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window