OXFORDSHIRE MARK MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAKE FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL GRANTS TO MEMBERS AND TO FORMER MEMBERS OF THE MARK MASONIC PROVINCE OF OXFORDSHIRE WHO ARE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF NEED. SUCH GRANTS ALSO EXTEND TO THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, WIDOWED MOTHERS, SPINSTER SISTERS, AND CHILDREN. DONATIONS MAY ALSO BE MADE TO A NUMBER OF NATIONWIDE ESTABLISHED MASONIC CHARITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 February 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Watson Wright | Chair | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN MCQUEEN | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HIS HONOUR JUDGE IAN DOUGLAS GAVIN ALEXA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.18k | £180 | £617 | £220 | £224 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £6.50k | £1.50k | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (ADOPTED) 07 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 08 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A FUND, HEREINAFTER CALLED THE FUND, TO WHICH ITS MEMBERS MAY SUBSCRIBE. THE FUND, OR ANY PART THEREOF, MAY BE APPLIED BY THE COMMITTEE AS CONSTITUTED IN BY-LAW 4 FOR ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES, NAMELY: A) THE COMMITTEE MAY MAKE GRANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF MARK MASTER MASONS WHO ARE OR WERE MEMBERS OF MARK LODGES OR ROYAL ARK MARINER LODGES IN THE MARK PROVINCE OF OXFORDSHIRE, OR THEIR WIVES/PARTNERS, WIDOWS, WIDOWED MOTHERS, SPINSTER SISTERS , OR THEIR CHILDREN BEING IN EVERY CASE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. EMERGENCY GRANTS MAY BE MADE IF AGREED BY THE CHAIRMAN, TREASURER, AND SECRETARY AND PUT BEFORE THE NEXT COMMITTEE MEETING FOR RATIFICATION. WIDOWS WHO REMARRY SHOULD NOT NECESSARILY BE EXCLUDED FROM OMMBA GRANTS. B) THE COMMITTEE MAY MAKE DONATIONS TO ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE BELOW LISTED CHARITIES, NAMELY: THE GRAND LODGE OF MARK MASTER MASONS FUND OF BENEVOLENCE THE GRAND CHARITY OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND THE MASONIC TRUST FOR BOYS AND GIRLS THE ROYAL MASONIC BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION THE NEW MASONIC SAMARITAN FUND OTHER TRUSTS OR BODIES WITHIN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE ESTABLISHED FOR REGISTERED CHARITABLE PURPOSES. C)GRANTS TO NON-CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS MAY BE CONSIDERED IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES BUT SHOULD FIRST BE AGREED BY THE COMMITTEE AND PRESIDENT
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9B Sunningwell Road
Sunningwell
ABINGDON
Oxfordshire
OX13 6BJ
- Phone:
- 01235524550
- Email:
- s.n.pope@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window