THE MCMILLAN FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exclusively charitable, including helping young people in the London Boroughs develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 February 2008: Standard registration
- THE JORDAN YOUTH DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic McMillan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles McMillan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brendan McMillan | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHERON MCMILLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY MCMILLAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £594 | £3.02k | £279 | £424 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11 | £204 | £260 | £357 | £3 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
STUDIO ONE
197 LONG LANE
LONDON
SE1 4PD
- Phone:
- 02074037403
- Email:
- terry@trademarkgroup.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window