Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH, NEWINGTON, FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1122652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.10k £8.66k £20.49k £6.18k £2.44k
Total expenditure £9.41k £2.63k £22.61k £2.40k £4.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A