THE RIVA CLUB/PROJECT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work based training activities and independent living skills for people with disabilities, incorporating a coffee shop and charity shop for the students to gain hands on experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 May 2008: Standard registration
- THE RIVA CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Muncie | Chair | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Grayshon | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pam Smith | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Allen | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reka Bartha | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Merrick | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBRA CLARKE | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.76k | £116.24k | £148.53k | £242.02k | £187.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.26k | £107.53k | £130.55k | £216.77k | £216.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.90k | £21.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.27k | £12.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2014 as amended on 25 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN SHEFFIELD. 2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3 TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO DISABLED PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, TRAINING AND ADVOCACY IN ORDER FOR THEM TO TAKE CONTROL OF THEIR LIVES AND LIVE AS THEY CHOOSE. 4 TO PROMOTE FULL PARTICIPATION, INTEGRATION AND FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THE YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR NON-DISABLED PEERS.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Laird Road
Wisewood
S6 4BS
- Phone:
- 01143270808
- Email:
- denise@rivaproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window