BEECH HILL COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUMMER AND WINTER FAYRES,TRIPS FOR COMMUNITY,NON UNIFORM DAYS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 13 March 2008: Standard registration
- BEECH HILL COMMUNITY JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JASON GOLDER | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Hull | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
VANESSA OLNEY | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER BARNES | Trustee | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kelly O'Dowd | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KERRY-ANN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £1.36k | £3.52k | £3.41k | £2.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.29k | £920 | £4.08k | £2.51k | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL TRUST DEED DATED 4 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF BEECH HILL COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL (SCHOOL FUND) BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED) BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. ACTIVITIES IN SUPPORT OF OBJECT 1. PROVIDING OF FACILITIES PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CHOSEN SUBJECT (WHICH MUST BE A VEHICLE TO PROMOTE A SINGLE POINT OF VIEW), BY LECTURES, RESEARCH, PUBLISHING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS, HANDS-ON TRAINING, PROVIDING EXTRA FACILITIES AT SCHOOLS, COLLEGES ETC, TO ALLOW THE SUBJECT TO BE STUDIED..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LUTON & BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Wychwood Avenue
LUTON
Bedfordshire
LU2 7HU
- Phone:
- 01582429434
- Email:
- admin@beechhillprimary.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window