SANDFORD ST MARTINS NURSERY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nursery School delivering care for children from the age of 2 years to 5 years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 06 February 2008: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.36k | £125.16k | £112.73k | £31.86k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.36k | £92.89k | £94.29k | £124.01k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 28 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 29 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 29 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 15 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 21 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 23 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 28 May 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND OPERATE AN ORGANISATION PROVIDING CRECHE AND NURSERY FACILITIES WHERE INFANTS MAY RECEIVE CARE AND TUITION; TO PROVIDE, OR CAUSE OTHERS TO PROVIDE MUSIC, GAMES AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND ENTERTAINMENT OF ALL KINDS AND GENERALLY ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST CHILDREN TO DO ANYTHING CALCULATED IN THE OPINION OF THE COMPANY TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION; TO PROVIDE NURSING FACILITIES, BOARDING ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER AMENITIES AND SERVICES WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE COMPANY MAY BE CONVENIENTLY PROVIDED; TO CARRY ON BUSINESS AS PRINTERS, PUBLISHERS, BOOKSELLERS, STATIONERS AND OUTFITTERS GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, PURBECK, DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window