CRANLEIGH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and support of charitable purposes directly connected with Cranleigh School, provision of Bursaries to local children in extreme need and development of education and educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 February 2008: Standard registration
- 03 August 2016: Funds received from 800587 CRANLEIGH SCHOOL MISSION FOR SOCIAL SERVICE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MONTAGUE JOHN MEYER | Chair | 09 February 2015 |
|
|||||
MARIE CHRISTINE ALLISON | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN JAMES LAJTHA MA FCIB | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|||||
CHRISTIAN JOHN DELLIERE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL PRESTON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BELINDA STEPHANIE GRAHAM-RACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW STUART CRONK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.00k | £371.00k | £1.57m | £397.00k | £475.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.00k | £32.00k | £197.00k | £101.00k | £123.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.25m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £270.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £46.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £14.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £49.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £148.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) 13 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") FOR WHICH THE FOUNDATION IS ESTABLISHED IS TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE DIRECTLY CONNECTED WITH CRANLEIGH SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL"); AND IN THE EVENT THAT THE SCHOOL CEASES TO EXIST TO PROMOTE OTHER EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CRANLEIGH SCHOOL
HORSESHOE LANE
CRANLEIGH
GU6 8QQ
- Phone:
- 01483273666
- Email:
- foundation@cranleigh.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window