THE TEA LEAF TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide education to disadvantaged Tamil, Sinhalese and Muslim communities that will improve their quality of life and stimulate/promote community cohesion through shared educational resources (where possible). We do this through teaching professional English language (reading and written). We also provide emotional health programmes to educate people about how to improve their mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 03 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caoimhe Ni Eochagain | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Naresh Mohan Sundaram | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naveen Arjuna Supramaniam | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ray | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laurenne Ajayi | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR YASMENE SHAH PHD | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.22k | £76.39k | £67.09k | £198.99k | £178.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.09k | £71.24k | £74.39k | £195.99k | £154.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING ANYWHERE IN SRI LANKA BUT PARTICULARLY IN TEA PLANTATION DISTRICTS BY: ASSISTING PEOPLE TO OBTAIN AND RETAIN EMPLOYMENT THROUGH TRAINING, IMPARTING SKILLS, EDUCATION, AND CREATION OF OPPORTUNITY; HELPING PEOPLE OF LOW INCOME OR IN POVERTY REGARDLESS OF THEIR RELIGION, CULTURE, GENDER OR PERSONAL SITUATIONS; ASSISTING IN BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION PROJECTS THAT WILL PROVIDE SHELTER AND INFRASTRUCTURE FOR LOCAL PEOPLE FOR ENHANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION, AND OF THEIR STANDARD OF LIFE THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF AGRICULTURE, INDUSTRY, TRADE, WATER SUPPLY AND SANITATION; AND ANY OTHER ACTIVITIES NECESSARY FOR OR ANCILLARY TO THE FOREGOING OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Shear Plot
Symondsbury
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 6HH
- Phone:
- +447419907394
- Email:
- info@tealeaftrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window