Trustees THE TEA LEAF TRUST
Charity Number: 1123427

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caoimhe Ni Eochagain | Chair | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Naresh Mohan Sundaram | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naveen Arjuna Supramaniam | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Ray | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Laurenne Ajayi | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR YASMENE SHAH PHD | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.