Financial history ABBOTSHAM CORNBOROUGH TRUST

Charity number: 1123278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.19k £10.80k £8.45k £8.23k £8.87k
Total expenditure £24.08k £7.28k £2.17k £646 £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A