GUA AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GUA Africa works with individuals and communities, helping them overcome the effects of war and poverty through the promotion of education. We are currently involved in school construction in South Sudan and child sponsorship within all levels of education in Kenya. The child sponsorship schemes are with Kenyan Primary level children and Secondary & University level Sudanese Refugees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kenya
Governance
- 23 April 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanuel Gatwitch | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kamahl Hoque | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Cappellaro | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mulholland | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tania Campbell Golding | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.89k | £36.89k | £44.87k | £62.15k | £115.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.80k | £33.80k | £48.37k | £58.92k | £110.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 APRIL 2008 AND SPECIAL WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA, BY: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. 2 THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING. 3 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. 4 THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PERSONS IN AREAS OF CONFLICT OR AFFECTED BY CONFLICT, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS. 5 THE RELIEF OF NEED OF ORPHANS BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
84
Buchanan Gardens
LONDON
London
NW10 5AE
- Phone:
- 07891748298
- Email:
- info@gua-africa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window