Financial history CHRIST CHURCH HAYWARDS HEATH

Charity Number: 1122949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £248.82k £309.09k £280.94k £464.78k £386.46k
Total expenditure £245.50k £265.03k £291.78k £311.80k £348.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A