Financial history SHRI GURU RAVIDASS CULTURAL ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1122946
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £480.18k £132.63k £138.62k £313.28k £367.81k
Total expenditure £409.99k £146.82k £136.12k £284.71k £268.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A